This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/26/2023 at 07:44:31 (UTC).

RIVER'S SIDE AT WASHINGTON SQUARE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION v. S.C. (RIVER'S SIDE)

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 RIVER'S SIDE AT WASHINGTON SQUARE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against C RIVER'S SIDE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9551

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

River's Side at Washington Square Homeowners Association

Respondent

Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

River's Side LLC

Eric Roe

Tommy Le

Michael Schimmel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Scott Williams

Beth Carolyn Tenney

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer Kay Stinnett

Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: River's Side at Washington Square Homeowners Association Attorney: Scott Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: To all parties: The court has granted permission to file the untimely answer to petition for review. The answer was filed on this date - May 22, 2023. A reply to the answer may be filed within 10 days after the answer is filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: River's Side LLC Attorney: Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas Real Party in Interest: Eric Roe Attorney: Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas Real Party in Interest: Tommy Le Attorney: Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas Real Party in Interest: Michael Schimmel Attorney: Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas Answer to petition for review filed. Due on 05/19/2023 By 11 Day(s) (FILED WITH PERMISSION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed; Notes: By Meighan A. McHugh Cardenas, counsel for real parties in interest, seeking relief to file an untimely answer to petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of real party in interest and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer to petition for review is extended to and including May 19, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: By Meighan A. Cardenas, counsel for real parties in interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Petitioner: River's Side at Washington Square Homeowners Association Attorney: Scott Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest requests an extension of 14 days to May 22, 2023 to file the answer to petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: River's Side at Washington Square Homeowners Association Attorney: Scott Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C095860; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CV20171712

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less