This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/02/2023 at 06:03:39 (UTC).

McGregor v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 McGregor filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcus, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7606

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marcus, Stephen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ikouree Mcgregor

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Stephen A. Marcus

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Hon. Stephen A. Marcus

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

Office of the District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed April 6, 2023. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Crim Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BA482540; Trial Court Judge: Marcus, Stephen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less