This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/11/2023 at 10:06:09 (UTC).

BACALL-TEHRANI v. CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 BACALL-TEHRANI filed an Other lawsuit against CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8299

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Lisa Bacall-Tehrani

Respondent and Defendant

Cedars Assisted Living, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

California Medical Association

California Dental Association

California Hospital Association

Association of Southern California Defense Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Joshua Peck

Joseph S. Klapach

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Barry M. Wolf

Alan R. Jampol

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Matthew S. Levinson

Cassidy Cole Davenport

Colin M Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Association of Southern California Defense Counsel Attorney: Colin M Harrison

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Medical Association Attorney: Cassidy Cole Davenport Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Dental Association Attorney: Cassidy Cole Davenport Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Hospital Association Attorney: Cassidy Cole Davenport The opinion does not meet the publication standards enumerated in rule 8.1105(c) of the California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B309663; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC673872

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less