This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2023 at 04:02:20 (UTC).

Carvajal v. Los Angeles Unified School District Board of Education

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Carvajal filed an Other lawsuit against Los Angeles Unified School District Board of Education. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5998

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Varina Carvajal

Respondent and Defendant

Los Angeles Unified School District Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Dev Deep Das

Ben Jared Meiselas

Jose Daniel Tapetillo

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Calvin R. House

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 19, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Varina Carvajal Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Varina CarvajalAttorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on February 13, 2023 is being returned to you for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 6, 2023: The minute order(s) indicate that a court reporter was not present at the time of hearing or trial. (proceeding dated: 8/31/2022). Therefore, the Civil Appeals Unit will not notify any court reporter(s) to prepare transcripts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #30692 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on December 08, 2022 by Varina Carvajal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV12716; Trial Court Judge: Mackey, Malcolm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less