This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/16/2023 at 20:02:39 (UTC).

CARUSO v. S.C. (CITY OF FRESNO)

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 CARUSO filed an Other lawsuit against C CITY OF FRESNO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5003

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Janice Caruso

Respondent

Superior Court of Fresno County

Interested Parties

City of Fresno

Community Hospitals of Central California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dmitriy Konstantinovich Karpov

Babak Kheiri

Daniel Danny Geoulla

Interested Party Attorneys

Mandy L. Jeffcoach

Kat Todd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/20/2022

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Janice Caruso Attorney: Dmitriy Konstantinovich Karpov

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F084359; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG02382

[+] Read More [-] Read Less