This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/05/2022 at 02:23:26 (UTC).

Caru Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals v. Dick Van Dam Dairy (+6)

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Caru Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals filed an Other lawsuit against Dick Van Dam Dairy 6. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Asberry, Irma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9731

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Asberry, Irma

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Caru Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals

Defendant and Respondent

Dick Van Dam Dairy (+6)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelsey Rinehart Eberly

Attorney at Animal Legal Defense Fund

525 E. Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Christopher Andrew Berry

Attorney at Animal Legal Defense Fund

525 E. Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Dana Marie Howard

Attorney at Larson, LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Chaitra G. Betageri

Attorney at Larson, LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Melissa Vasquez

Attorney at Larson, LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stephen G. Larson

Attorney at Larson LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Paul Anthony Rigali

Attorney at Larson LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Upon written stipulation filed by the parties to the appeal, the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).) Each party to bear own costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Upon written stipulation filed by the parties to the appeal, the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).) Each party to bear own costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Stipulated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The above-entitled matter has been transferred to the Fourth Appellate District, Division One. The appeal has been assigned case number D079731. Please direct any future correspondence or inquiries to this court. Division One maintains a comprehensive internet web site containing information on electronic filing, case information (except on confidential cases), oral argument calendars, opinions, local rules, frequently asked questions, and practices and procedures. The web site can be accessed at: http://www.courts.ca.gov/4dca.htm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case transferred to San Diego per Supreme Court order.; Notes: Rec'd order dated Nov 17, 2021; CRC 10.1000(a)(1)(D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: An extension was granted pursuant to stipulation. Appellant is notified of no further extensions.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration.; Notes: Sarah Spitler in support of motion for reconsideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By appellant (entitled "Motion for reconsideration of order dismissing appeal")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: ****VACATED PER COURT'S ORDER FILED AUG 19, 2021**** Appeal is dismissed as untimely.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jul 12, 2021; By respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jul 8, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case transferred to San Diego per Supreme Court order.; Notes: Dtd Jun 30, 2021; Caru Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to AnimalsE077350

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC2003864; Trial Court Judge: Asberry, Irma

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less