This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/05/2021 at 13:33:39 (UTC).

Carradine v. iDrip Vape, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Carradine filed an Other lawsuit against iDrip Vape, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crowley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7443

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crowley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Roneisha Carradine

Defendants and Respondents

iDrip Vape, LLC.

Luma Rehani

Eyad Rihani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Daniel B. Miller

Wilshire Law Firm, Plc 3055 Wilshire Blvd - 12Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Ronald Zurek

Attorney at Wesierski & Zurek

100 Corson St. Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91103

Stephen Charles Pasarow

Attorney at Knapp Petersen & Clarke

550 North Brand Blvd. Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed Dec 15, 2020: 8.124 no.RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed November 12, 2020, is vacated and the appeal filed September 1, 2020, is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant must serve and file a notice of designating the record on appeal pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and/or 8.130 within 15 days from the date of this order. All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order is to be submitted via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111-A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Self-represented parties are not required to electronically file and may comply with this order at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 15 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed September 1, 2020, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed on Oct 22, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Roneisha Carradine Attorney: Daniel B. Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Due Date: 03/15/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Roneisha CarradineAttorney: Daniel B. Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Roneisha CarradineAttorney: Daniel B. Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card Roneisha Carradine, Plaintiff and Appellant Daniel B. Miller, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 1, 2020: Roneisha Carradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC716139; Trial Court Judge: Crowley, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iDrip Vape, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER DANIEL B.