This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2022 at 22:54:24 (UTC).

Carmel House, LLC et al. v. Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Carmel House, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Alameda. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wise, Noel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3158

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wise, Noel

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Carmel House, LLC

Maas Commons, LLC

133 North Temple, LLC

Hidden Lake, LLC

LG Creek Apartments, LLC

Maas Taxco, LLC

Mission Park Gilroy, LLC

Penthouse, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Not Yet Classified and Interested Parties

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Vasona Management, Inc.

Project Sentinel

Charlie Blest, J.B., a minor, by his guardian ad litem, Charlie Best

David Hammerbeck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

John G. Heller

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California Street - 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sharon O. Rossi

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California Street - 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Lauren Kramer Sujeeth

Attorney at Rogers Joseph O'Donnell

311 California St 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Not Yet Classified and Interested Party Attorneys

Chaya Mayim Mandelbaum

Attorney at Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe, LLP

351 California St Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94104-2408

Michelle G. Lee

Attorney at Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Martha Liliana Gomez

Attorney at CA Dept of Fair Employment & Housing

320 W 4Th St Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90013-2489

Adam Bryan Chayes

Attorney at CA Dept of Fair Employment & Housing

2218 Kausen Drive, Suite 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Sue Jong Noh

Attorney at CA Dept of Fair Employment & Housing

2218 Kausen Drive, Suite 100 10Th Floor

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Denis Francis Shanagher

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

Spear Twr, One Market Plaza, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

James Kenneth Holder

Attorney at Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

William Luther Marchant

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

Spear Twr, One Market Plaza Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105-1127

Mollie Michelle Burks

Attorney at Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Liza Allegra Cristol-Deman

Attorney at Brancart & Brancart

P O Box 686

Pescadero, CA 94060

Annie Yuan Pan

Attorney at Project Sentinel

39155 Liberty St Ste D440

Fremont, CA 94538-1520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief is denied. (Gov. Code, 12981, subd. (a) ["The civil action shall be filed in any county in the state in which the unlawful practice is alleged to have been committed, in the county in which the records relevant to that practice are maintained and administered, or in the county in which the aggrieved person would have resided in the housing accommodation."], italics added; see Brown v. Superior Court (1984) 37 Cal.3d 477, 487 ["The wide choice of venue afforded plaintiffs by the FEHA venue statute effectuates enforcement of that law by permitting venue in a county which plaintiffs deem the most appropriate and convenient."].) Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief is denied. (Gov. Code, 12981, subd. (a) ["The civil action shall be filed in any county in the state in which the unlawful practice is alleged to have been committed, in the county in which the records relevant to that practice are maintained and administered, or in the county in which the aggrieved person would have resided in the housing accommodation."], italics added; see Brown v. Superior Court (1984) 37 Cal.3d 477, 487 ["The wide choice of venue afforded plaintiffs by the FEHA venue statute effectuates enforcement of that law by permitting venue in a county which plaintiffs deem the most appropriate and convenient."].) Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.; Notes: To opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Filed by RPI: Priject Sentinel, Charlie Blest, JV, a Minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Charlie Blest, and David Hammerbeck.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: RPI Counsel (previously added.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Notice of Preliminary Non-opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition Filed by Attorneys for Real Party in Interest Department of Fair Employment and Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Chaya Mandelbaum and Michelle Lee associated as counsel of record for Real Party in Interest Department of Fair Employment and Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Dear Real Party in Interest/Counsel: Your client is named as real party in interest in the above-captioned writ proceeding, which has been assigned to Division 1. The Court requests that you serve and file opposition, if any, to the petition on or before August 16, 2021. Your opposition may be in letter form and electronically filed through TrueFiling. If you are not filing an opposition, please inform the Court in writing. Counsel are required to list their State Bar numbers on all documents sent to the Court. Petitioner may serve and file a reply to the opposition on or before August 20, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief From Order Denying Motion for Change of Venue by the Alameda County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20078727; Trial Court Judge: Wise, Noel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PENTHOUSE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant