This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/03/2021 at 03:57:14 (UTC).

Carlis v. Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Carlis filed an Other lawsuit against Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8545

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Marc Carlis

Appellant and Defendant

Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Marshall Mayes Searcy

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

865 So. Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Zheng Liu

Attorney at Aptum Law

750 Alam Lane #8244

Foster City, CA 90440

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S. Attorney: Zheng Liu [ ONE VOLUME OF APPENDIX ATTACHED TO THE BRIEF ]One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/29/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/29/2021 By 60 Day(s) 02/04/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/29/2021 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 05/14/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Marc CarlisAttorney: Marshall Mayes Searcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S.Attorney: Zheng Liu; Notes: [ ONE VOLUME OF APPENDIX ATTACHED TO THE BRIEF ]One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/29/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/29/2021 By 60 Day(s) 02/04/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/29/2021 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference held.; Notes: NOT SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference scheduled for:; Notes: March 1, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. via Zoom. (Sauer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Appellant sent form. Matter placed back in mediation program.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Matter removed from mediation program due to appellant's lack of participation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed Dec 1, 2020: Respondent elects additional documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed Nov 19, 2020: Appendix no.RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Request for Mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: LASC Check# TS0029860558 for $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S. Attorney: Zheng Liu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Beijing Pu Luo Media Company U.S.Attorney: Zheng Liu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed October 16, 2020 by Beijing Pu Luo Media Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV09847; Trial Court Judge: Landin, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEIJING PU LUO MEDIA COMPANY U.S. is a litigant