This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 00:12:05 (UTC).

Cardenas et al. v. Kia Motors America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Cardenas filed an Other lawsuit against Kia Motors America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7721

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Josefina Cardenas

Cristina Vejar

Defendant and Respondent

Kia Motors America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Charles Altman

Radomir R. Kirnos

Cynthia E. Tobisman

Laura Grace Lim

Christopher John Urner

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jonathan Sniderman

Jimmy Yongki Park

Marcelo Lee

Julian Gallus Senior

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: Status letter.every 45 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Status letter pursuant to court order. As of May 12, 2023, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for more than a year. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument. Two courts, however, have since disagreed with Niedermeier, namely Figueroa v. FCA (2022) 84 Cal.App.5th 708, 710-716 (Figueroa), and Williams v. FCA (Cal. Ct. App., Feb. 1, 2023, No. C091902) __ Cal.Rptr.3d __, 2023 WL 1430403, at *4-10. The Supreme Court granted review of Figueroa and deferred further action in the matter "pending consideration and disposition of a related issue in Niedermeier v. FCA US LLC, 266034."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Status letter pursuant to court order. As of February 14, 2023, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for more than a year. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument. Two courts, however, have since disagreed with Niedermeier, namely Figueroa v. FCA (2022) 84 Cal.App.5th 708, 710-716 (Figueroa), and Williams v. FCA (Cal. Ct. App., Feb. 1, 2023, No. C091902) __ Cal.Rptr.3d __, 2023 WL 1430403, at *4-10. The Supreme Court granted review of Figueroa and deferred further action in the matter "pending consideration and disposition of a related issue in Niedermeier v. FCA US LLC, 266034."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Status letter pursuant to court order. As of February 14, 2023, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for more than a year. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument. Two courts, however, have since disagreed with Niedermeier, namely Figueroa v. FCA (2022) 84 Cal.App.5th 708, 710-716 (Figueroa), and Williams v. FCA (Cal. Ct. App., Feb. 1, 2023, No. C091902) __ Cal.Rptr.3d __, 2023 WL 1430403, at *4-10. The Supreme Court granted review of Figueroa and deferred further action in the matter "pending consideration and disposition of a related issue in Niedermeier v. FCA US LLC, 266034."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: appellants' counsel, stating that "As of December 30, 2022, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for more than a year. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP, counsel for appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Status letter pursuant to court order. As of November 17, 2022, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for roughly a year. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Status letter pursuant to court order. As of October 3, 2022, Niedermeier has been fully briefed for over 10 months. The Supreme Court has not yet scheduled oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Denied - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all deadlines in the above-captioned appeal are suspended pending further order of this Court. Appellants shall keep this court advised of the status of proceedings in the Supreme Court. All update letters must be served on opposing counsel and filed with this Court.) Appellants shall file status letter with this Court beginning October 3, 2022 and every 45 days thereafter. Failure to timely file these status letters will result in deadlines being reinstated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 31, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Josefina Cardenas Attorney: Radomir R. Kirnos Plaintiff and Appellant: Cristina Vejar Attorney: Radomir R. Kirnos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: The law firm of Knight Law Group LLP associate the law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-counsel of record for appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Josefina CardenasAttorney: Cynthia E. Tobisman Attorney: Laura Grace Lim Attorney: Radomir R. Kirnos Plaintiff and Appellant: Cristina Vejar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Josefina CardenasAttorney: Radomir R. Kirnos Plaintiff and Appellant: Cristina VejarAttorney: Radomir R. Kirnos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 398820 for $775.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on January 19, 2022 by Josefina Cardenas et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC658133; Trial Court Judge: Keosian, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less