This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2022 at 00:20:37 (UTC).

Canyon View Limited v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Canyon View Limited filed an Other lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandvig, Melvin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2642

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sandvig, Melvin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Canyon View Limited

Appellant and Defendant

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kathleen Dority Fuster

16255 Ventura Blvd Suite 600

Encino, CA 91436

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sanford Shatz

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

18201 Von Karman Ave Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 02/14/2022 By 61 Day(s) **STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BRIEFS**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-21 (6123 Pages) R-7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated July 6, 2021: 8.122 w. RT - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service to civil case information statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Robin Meadow is substituted in as counsel of record and Kathleen Fuster is substituted out as counsel for respondent, Canyon View Limited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Attorney: Sanford Shatz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 02/14/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.Attorney: Sanford Shatz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.Attorney: Sanford Shatz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (U)Civil filing fee paid by McGlinchey Stafford.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 9, 2021: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: PC057040; Trial Court Judge: Sandvig, Melvin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON VIEW LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shatz, Sanford