This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/26/2022 at 00:39:59 (UTC).

Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates v. The Bank of America N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates filed an Other lawsuit against The Bank of America N A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pfahler, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2259

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pfahler, Stephen

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates

Respondents, Appellants and Defendants

The Bank of America N.A.

Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates

The Bank of New York Mellon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Dority Fuster

16255 Ventura Blvd Suite 600

Encino, CA 91436

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Respondent, Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Sanford Shatz

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

18201 Von Karman Ave Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92612

Kathleen Dority Fuster

16255 Ventura Blvd Suite 600

Encino, CA 91436

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Voicemail from respondent's counsel stating that his clerk's transcript is missing. Call returned, left voicemail. This Court does not have a copy of any designation filed by respondent/cross-appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates Attorney: Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/30/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of America N.A.Attorney: Sanford Shatz Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of New York Mellon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View EstatesAttorney: Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of America N.A. Attorney: Sanford Shatz Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of New York Mellon Attorney: Sanford Shatz (X)(Cross Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of America N.A.Attorney: Sanford Shatz Defendant and Appellant: The Bank of New York MellonAttorney: Sanford Shatz; Notes: (X)(Cross Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 21, 2021: Bank of America, N.A., et al. - (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View Estates Attorney: Kathleen Dority Fuster (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Canyon View Limited dba Canyon View EstatesAttorney: Kathleen Dority Fuster; Notes: (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Robin Meadow of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP substitutes in as counsel of record for appellant Canyon View Limited in place and instead of Kathleen Dority Fuster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellant's notice filed in trial court on 4/30/2021 ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 8043 for $775.00 (Krane & Smith)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/21/2021 by Canyon View Limited, dba Canyon view Estates ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: PC057199; Trial Court Judge: Pfahler, Stephen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON VIEW LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen Dority Fuster