This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/02/2022 at 22:17:14 (UTC).

CANNISTRACI v. CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 CANNISTRACI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0304

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Steven Douglas Cannistraci

Respondents and Defendants

City of Los Angeles

James Lefton

Ralph Corinne

Does 1-20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Gregg Handzlik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service Steven Douglas Cannistraci, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Steven Douglas Cannistraci Pro Per *Filed with Permission*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely petition for review with deficiency: missing court of appeal opinion. Filer asked to resubmit as soon as possible.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303771; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC677199

[+] Read More [-] Read Less