This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/05/2021 at 10:12:04 (UTC).

Campbell v. Wood

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Campbell filed an Other lawsuit against Wood. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bean, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1077

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bean, Sandra

 

Party Details

Defendants, Respondents and Plaintiffs

Phillip Campbell

Oakland, CA 94612

Andrea C. Wood

Orinda, CA 94563

Plaintiff, Appellant and Defendant

Andrea C. Wood

Orinda, CA 94563

Not Yet Classified

Taylor W. Packwood

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal of appeal in this court, the appeal is dismissed and the remittitur is to issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal of appeal in this court, the appeal is dismissed and the remittitur is to issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: failure to state how many days to eot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry follow-up due.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The application for waiver of filing fees and costs is granted as to filing fee only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Andrea C. Wood Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Andrea C. WoodPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/09/2020. Designating CT with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/31/2020 by Andrea C. Wood in propria persona appealing judgment from 06/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RP08418180; Trial Court Judge: Bean, Sandra

    Read MoreRead Less