This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2022 at 01:09:47 (UTC).

Camano Group, Inc. v. National Default Servicing Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Camano Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against National Default Servicing Corp. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coats, Benjamin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6169

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coats, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified

Camano Group, Inc.

Respondent and Cross Defendant

National Default Servicing Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael S. Robinson

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Conners LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elmira Rezaei Howard

Attorney at Anderson McPharlin & Conners LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Chad L Butler

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

1455 Frazee Road Suite 820

San Diego, CA 92108-6637

Megan E Lees

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

1455 Frazee Rd Ste 820

San Diego, CA 92108-4395

Brigitte Ann Tuminez Castro

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco P.A.

1455 Frazee Road Suite 820

San Diego, CA 92108

Brandon J. Mika

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco P.A.

1455 Frazee Road Suite 820

San Diego, CA 92108-2108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondent shall recover the cost on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to Request, the appeal filed November 5, 2021 is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: (C-3/731p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Camano Group, Inc. Attorney: Michael S. Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Camano Group, Inc.Attorney: Michael S. Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CT's only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 11-5-21 by aplt. Camano Group, Inc.; from 8-25-21 judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2018-00517930-CU-OR-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Coats, Benjamin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camano Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, CHAD L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J.