This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 00:18:43 (UTC).

Calvary Church of God in Christ, Inc. v. Balboa, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 Calvary Church of God in Christ, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Balboa, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Asberry, Irma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0535

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Asberry, Irma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Respondents

Calvary Church of God in Christ, Inc.

First American Title Company

First American Title Insurance Company

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant

Balboa, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

A George Glasco

Attorney at LAW OFFICEs OF A. GEORGE GLASCO, P.C.

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 810

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Candie Y Chang

Attorney at Garrett & Tully, APC

225 South Lake Avenue, Suite 1400

Pasadena, CA 91101

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant Attorney

William R. Larr

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Conners, LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3623

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.; Notes: E-filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Respondent's counsel RE: SCIF due 03/03/23. Attached another copy of notice and SCIF for completion and return by the end of business today.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Applnt's letter brief in Response to Court's February 8, 2023 Order, CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file response to court order - not necessary since response was also submitted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellant's Letter Brief in Response to Court's February 8, 2023 Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court requests appellant file a letter memorandum with this court on or before 15 days following the date of this order, informing whether and on what basis First American Title Company and First American Title Insurance Company should be included as respondents in this appeal. The court requires this information to determine the identities of the parties to this appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jan 30, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: emailed to parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 19, 2023; Balboa, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1826920; Trial Court Judge: Asberry, Irma

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less