This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/12/2022 at 01:47:12 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SPORTFISHING PROTECTION ALLIANCE v. S.C. (SAN LUIS AND DELTA-MENDOTA WATER AUTHORITY)

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 CALIFORNIA SPORTFISHING PROTECTION ALLIANCE filed an Other lawsuit against C SAN LUIS AND DELTA-MENDOTA WATER AUTHORITY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6754

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent

Superior Court of Stanislaus County

Interested Parties

Widren Water District GSA

Central Delta-Mendota Groundwater Sustainability Agency

County of Merced

Grassland Resource Conservation District

City of Patterson GSA

Northwestern Delta-Mendota GSA

City of Dos Palos

City of Los Banos Groundwater Sustainability Agency

Aliso Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency

Turner Island Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency - 2

Patterson Irrigation District GSA

Farmers Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency

City of Firebaugh GSA

San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Groundwater Sustainability Agency

City of Dos Palos Groundwater Sustainability Agency

City of Newman Groundwater Sustainability Agency

San Luis and Delta-Mendota Water Authority

County of Merced Groundwater Sustainability Agency - Delta Mendota

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Gary W. Sawyers

Joseph M. Marchini

Jeff B. Grant

Ellen Lee Wehr

Barbara Anne Brenner

Matthew Dwight Zinn

William A. Vaughn

Valerie C. Kincaid

David Edward Holland

Jeanne Marie Zolezzi

Ann M. Grottveit

James C. Sanchez

Andrew John McClure

Other Attorneys

Shawn Mathew George

Alan Frederick Doud

Kyle Richard Roberson

John Patrick Kinsey

Michael Robert Linden

Thomas N. Lippe

Eugene Tanaka

4 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Stay Dissolved; Petition Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay dissolved; petition denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The petition for writ of supersedeas is denied. The temporary stay issued on March 2, 2021 is dissolved.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance Attorney: Nathaniel Kane *Received before 3:00 p.m.*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Aliso Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Valerie C. Kincaid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Joinder to answer filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: County of Fresno Groundwater Sustainability Agency for Delta-Mendota Management Area A and B Attorney: Kyle Richard Roberson County of Fresno joins in Farmers Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency's Answer and San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Water Authority Groundwater Sustainability Agency's Answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: County of Merced Attorney: Jeff B. Grant Real Party in Interest: Merced County Delta-Mendota Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Jeff B. Grant Real Party in Interest: Grassland Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Ellen Lee Wehr Real Party in Interest: Grassland Water District Attorney: Ellen Lee Wehr Real Party in Interest: Grassland Resource Conservation District Attorney: Ellen Lee Wehr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: City of Newman Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Barbara Anne Brenner Real Party in Interest: County of Merced Attorney: Jeff B. Grant Real Party in Interest: Merced County Delta-Mendota Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Jeff B. Grant Real Party in Interest: San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Water Authority Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Andrew John McClure Real Party in Interest: City of Firebaugh GSA Attorney: James C. Sanchez Real Party in Interest: City of Los Banos Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: William A. Vaughn Real Party in Interest: City of Dos Palos Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Edward M. Amaral Real Party in Interest: City of Dos Palos Attorney: Edward M. Amaral Real Party in Interest: Turner Island Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency - 2 Attorney: Edward M. Amaral Real Party in Interest: City of Mendota GSA Attorney: John Patrick Kinsey Real Party in Interest: City of Gustine Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Eugene Tanaka Real Party in Interest: County of Madera GSA and County of Madera -3 GSA Attorney: Michael Robert Linden Real Party in Interest: County of Fresno Groundwater Sustainability Agency for Delta-Mendota Management Area A and B Attorney: Kyle Richard Roberson *Before 3:00 p.m.***Second answer to petition for review.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Farmers Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Ann M. Grottveit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including April 22, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Water Authority Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Andrew John McClure Real Party in Interest: San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Groundwater Sustainability Agency Attorney: Andrew John McClure Opposition to request for immediate temporary stay.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Supersedeas Vol. 1 of 2 California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, Petitioner Nathaniel Kane, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay application filed (separate petition pending); Notes: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, Petitioner Nathaniel Kane, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed; Notes: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, Petitioner Thomas N. Lippe, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter informing the Court that real party in interest Aliso Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency does not intend to file an answer to petition for review.Aliso Water District Groundwater Sustainability Agency, Real party in interest Valerie C. Kincaid, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Counsel and all parties: Dear Counsel: The court has granted permission to file the petition for review in excess of 8,400 words and the petition was filed on January 22, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Petitioner: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance Attorney: Thomas N. Lippe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance Attorney: Thomas N. Lippe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F082220; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Stanislaus County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CV-20-001748

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less