This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2023 at 08:19:59 (UTC).

California Republican Party v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 California Republican Party filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Howard, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0138

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Howard, Theodore

 

Party Details

Petitioner

California Republican Party

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Theodore R. Howard 700 Civic Center Dr West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Christel Gibbons

Richard Ruehle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mark Vranjes

Attorney at Royce, Grimm, Vranjes, Mc Cormick & Grah

P. O. Box 129012

San Diego, CA 92101

Mark G. Bonino

Attorney at Hayes, Scott, Bonino et al. LLP

999 Skyway Rd Ste 310

San Carlos, CA 94071

Interested Party Attorneys

Megan Janet Demshki

Attorney at Aitken Aitken Cohn

7121 Magnolia Ave Ste A

Riverside, CA 92504-3805

Christopher R. Aitken

Attorney at Aitken, Aitken & Cohn

3 Macarthur Pl., Ste. 800

Santa Ana, CA 92707-2555

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed - ALL DOCUMENTS SCANNED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. ARONSON, ACTING P. J. * Before Aronson, Acting P. J., Ikola, J., and Goethals, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 6 volumes exhibits in support of petition(2180 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: stay requested for 05/03/21 Petitioner: California Republican Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00912044; Trial Court Judge: Howard, Theodore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The California Republican Party is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant