This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/21/2022 at 22:50:12 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION v. AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9212

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

California Medical Association

Defendant and Respondent

Aetna Health of California, Inc

Not Yet Classified

Service Employees International Union California State Council

California Labor Federation

International Brotherhood of Teamsters Joint Council 7

United Farm Workers of America

Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Alan M. Mansfield

Attorney at Whatley Kallas, LLP

16870 West Bernardo Drive, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92127

Stacey M. Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Michael Rubin

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon, LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Grant Geyerman

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Craig Singer

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Elizabeth Anne Mitchell

Attorney at Spertus Landes & Umhofer, LLP

1990 South Bundy Drive, Suite 705

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Enu A Mainigi

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Matthew D. Umhofer

Attorney at Spertus, Landes & Umhofer, LLP

1990 South Bundy Drive, Suite 705

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benjamin N. Hazelwood

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Stacey Monica Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (granted case); Notes: Application of Sarah Weiner to appear as pro hac vice for amicus curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: By Henry Weissmann, counsel for amicus curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, seeking an extension to June 15, 2022 to file their amicus curiae brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply brief filed (case fully briefed); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: California Medical Association Attorney: Michael Rubin Reply brief filed (case fully briefed). Due on 04/15/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Reply brief filed (case fully briefed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of appellant and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the reply brief on the merits is extended to and including April 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: By Stacy M. Leyton, counsel for appellant, seeking a 60 day extension of time to April 15, 2022 to file the reply brief on the merits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer brief on the merits filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Aetna Health of California, Inc Attorney: Matthew D. Umhofer Answer brief on the merits filed. Due on 01/25/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Answer brief on the merits filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of respondent and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer brief on the merits is extended to and including January 25, 2022 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: by Matthew D. Umhofer, counsel for respondent, seeking a 60 day extension to January 25, 2022 to file the answer brief on the merits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Service Employees International Union California State Council Attorney: Stacey Monica Leyton Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Labor Federation Attorney: Stacey Monica Leyton Pub/Depublication Requestor: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Joint Council 7 Attorney: Stacey Monica Leyton Pub/Depublication Requestor: United Farm Workers of America Attorney: Stacey Monica Leyton Pub/Depublication Requestor: Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. Attorney: Stacey Monica Leyton (Filed With Permission)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed; Notes: Application to File Late Request for Depublication (depublication request attached to application)Service Employees International Union California State Council, Pub/Depublication Requestor Stacey Monica Leyton, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- California Labor Federation, Pub/Depublication Requestor Stacey Monica Leyton, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- International Brotherhood of Teamsters Joint Council 7, Pub/Depublication Requestor Stacey Monica Leyton, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- United Farm Workers of America, Pub/Depublication Requestor Stacey Monica Leyton, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Pub/Depublication Requestor Stacey Monica Leyton, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Aetna Health of California, Inc Attorney: Matthew D. Umhofer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Application of Grant Geyerman to appear as counsel for Defendant-Respondent Aetna Health of California, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Application of Enu Mainigi to appear as counsel for Defendant-Respondent Aetna Health of California, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Application of Craig Singer to appear as counsel for Defendant-Respondent Aetna Health of California, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Application of Benjamin Hazelwood to appear as counsel for Defendant-Respondent Aetna Health of California, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: California Medical Association Attorney: Alan M. Mansfield

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B304217; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC487412

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Medical Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA LABOR FEDERATION, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA WEST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Farm Workers of America is a litigant