This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2022 at 13:09:49 (UTC).

California Department of Education et al. v. Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 California Department of Education filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weil, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5070

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weil, Edward

 

Party Details

Petitioners

California Department of Education

Tony Thurmond

State Board of Education

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Interested Parties

Mark S.

Rosa T.

Jessica Black

Michell Redfoot

Nefertari Royston, Dr.

Pittsburg Unified School District

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Leonard Bruce Garfinkel

Attorney at California Dept of Education

1430 N St Ste 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Amy Elizabeth Bisson-Holloway

Attorney at Dept Of Education/Legal Ofc

1430 N Street, Suite 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Interested Party Attorneys

Linnea L Nelson

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

39 Drumm St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Victor Leung

Attorney at ACLU of Southern California

1313 W 8Th St

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Claudia Center

Attorney at Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

Amanda Carolyne Schwartz

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

One Market Plaza Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ana Graciela Najera Mendoza

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 W 8Th St Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4441

Brandon Lashawn Greene

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Grayce S. Zelphin

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Malhar Parimal Shah

Attorney at DREDF

3075 Adeline St Ste 210

Berkeley, CA 94703-2578

Robyn Carrico Crowther

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jimmie Emile Johnson

Attorney at Leone & Alberts APC

1390 Willow Pass Rd Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520-7913

Katherine Ann Alberts

Attorney at LEONE & ALBERTS

1390 Willow Pass Rd., Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

Jacquelyn Young

Attorney at Dept of Justice

Office Of The Attorney General 300 S Spring St

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Andrew Zachary Edelstein

Attorney at Deputy Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request for Immediate Stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request for Immediate Stay are denied. (tuc, fuj, pet)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: "PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR PROHIBITION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: RPI's intent ot file opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: On April 29, 2022, the Attorney General served and filed a document entitled "State of California's Joinder In Petition For Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request For Immediate Stay." The document simply states, "that petitioner-defendant State of California hereby joins in petitioners-defendants California Department of Education, Tony Thurmond, and State Board of Education's Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request for Immediate Stay, filed on April 28, 2022." To the extent the State of California seeks to join in the petition for writ of mandate such request is denied, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to strike the filing of April 29, 2022. This denial is without prejudice to the filing of a formal petition for writ in compliance with all applicable statutes and court rules or a brief as a real party in interest supporting the petition. (See Bridget A. v. Superior Court (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 285, 300, fn. 5; see also Eisenberg et al., Cal. Practice Guide: Civil Appeals & Writs (The Rutter Group 2021) 15:141 ["Any coparty who wants to join in the writ petition should expressly be made a copetitioner (or file a separate writ petition)"].)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed joinder of:; Notes: RPI State of California's Joinder in Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request for Immediate Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: File 3 of 3, Volumes 2-2, PP. 725-1036 Exhibits 18 - 30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: File 2 of 3, Volumes 1-2, Vol. 1 . PP. 09-724 Exhibits 1 - 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate stay requested as to all proceedings in trial court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSN211755; Trial Court Judge: Weil, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Education is a litigant