This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/14/2021 at 01:25:31 (UTC).

California Capital Insurance Company v. Employers Compensation Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 California Capital Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Employers Compensation Insurance Company. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0532

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

California Capital Insurance Company

Appellant and Defendant

Employers Compensation Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Lance Orloff

Attorney at Grant, Genovese & Baratta. LLP

2030 Main Street., Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jordon Edward Harriman

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C. Street Ste 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 12/20/2021 By 61 Day(s) by 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 RT, pages 1-98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR Karen Hutchison, Lori Anastasiou, Keri Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/06/21 (8.124 with RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Aplt associates in as co-counsel on appeal Atty Jeffry A. Miller with same law firm of Lewis/Brisgaard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: aplt Employers Compensation Insurance Companyalso appealing order from 07/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00928693; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYERS COMPENSATION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER JEFFREY A. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIMAN JORDON