This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2022 at 01:18:50 (UTC).

California Business & Industrial Alliance v. Becerra

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 California Business Industrial Alliance filed an Other lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9561

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

California Business & Industrial Alliance

Respondent and Defendant

Xavier Becerra

Amicus Curiae

California Business Roundtable

Chamber of Commerce of USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Brock Joseph Seraphin

Attorney at Epstein Becker Green

1925 Century Park E Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2706

Richard Frey

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 S Grand Ave Ste 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3151

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Aaron David Jones

Attorney at CA Dept of Justice

455 Golden Gate Ave Ste 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Ronald Chester Cohen

Attorney at LevatoLaw, LLP

2601 Main Street, Suite 1030

Irvine, CA 92614

Robert Edward Dunn

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

99 South Almaden Boulevard Suite 642

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause called. Richard Frey argued for appellant. Aaron Jones argued for respondent. Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Aplt SUBS OUT Atty Richard Frey with Epstein Becker & Green and SUBS IN Atty Richard Frey with Nixon Peabody LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: by respondentOne extension granted for a total of 30 days: 02/14/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/24/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Response to Amicus Brief: Missing bookmarks for the Table of Contents, Table of Authorities and Proof of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument continued to:; Notes: Respondent's request to continue oral argument is GRANTED. The matter previously calendared for Friday, April 22, 2022, at 1:30 P.M., is CONTINUED to the May 2022 oral argument calendar. Notice will be given of the new date and time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $50 for copy work

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: Respondent's request to continue oral argument.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal, reinstate the appeal, and be relieved from default is GRANTED. The order of dismissal is VACATED and the appeal is REINSTATED. Orange County Superior Court, Appellate Division is directed to accept the fees for the preparation of the record on appeal, provided the fees are paid within 10 days from the date of this order. If appellant fails to comply and the Superior Court notifies this court of the non-compliance, the appeal may be dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Aplt's motion to vacate dismissal: Missing bookmarks and not paginated correctly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed October 20, 2020, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to deposit costs in a timely manner for preparation of the record on appeal. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Superior Court clerk L. Duran: Notice of Failure to Comply with Notice of Default: Appellant failed to deposit funds and/or substitute to cover each hearing date requested in the designation of Record on Appeal as required by CRC rules 8.130(b) and 8.130(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt: California Business & Industrial Alliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01035180; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chamber of Commerce of USA is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ROUNDTABLE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN, ROBERT EDWARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN RONALD CHESTER