This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/15/2023 at 06:06:06 (UTC).

Caiozzo v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Caiozzo filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duffy-Lewis, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2525

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cally Williams Caiozzo

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Beachwood Canyon Commercial, LLC.; Gregory Paul Williams; James Linardos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mark L. Share

Attorney at DeCastro, West, Chodorow, Mendler & Glickfield, Inc.

10690 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3881

Joseph Scott Klapach

Attorney at Klapach & Klapach, P.C.

15303 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1510

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Randy N. Aguirre

Attorney at Goodkin Law Group, APC

1800 Century Park East 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6051

Daniel Louis Goodkin

Attorney at Goodkin Law Group, APC

1800 Century Park East 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: * As demonstrated by the November 28, 2022 minute order, the superior court held a hearing on this court's alternative writ of mandate and vacated its June 1, 2022 order compelling arbitration of petitioner's fifth cause of action seeking involuntary dissolution pursuant to Corporations Code section 17707.03, subdivision (a), in compliance with paragraph (a) of the alternative writ. It is hereby ordered that the alternative writ is discharged, the January 12, 2023 hearing is vacated, and the petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: * As demonstrated by the November 28, 2022 minute order, the superior court held a hearing on this court's alternative writ of mandate and vacated its June 1, 2022 order compelling arbitration of petitioner's fifth cause of action seeking involuntary dissolution pursuant to Corporations Code section 17707.03, subdivision (a), in compliance with paragraph (a) of the alternative writ. It is hereby ordered that the alternative writ is discharged, the January 12, 2023 hearing is vacated, and the petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Superior Court Counsel dated November 28, 2022 re: minute order dated November 28, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of respondent court's entry of November 28, 2022 order vacating its June 1, 2022 order, filed by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petitioner's proof of service on respondent court of this court's November 16, 2022 alternative writ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Superior Court Counsel dated November 17, 2022 re: attached minute order dated November 16, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY: GOOD CAUSE appearing, you are hereby ordered to: (a)vacate the order of June 1, 2022, entered in Los Angeles Superior Court (LASC) Case No. 21STCV30656, only insofar as it ordered arbitration of petitioner's fifth cause of action seeking involuntary judicial dissolution of the Beachwood Master Commercial, LLC, pursuant to Corporations Code section 17707.03, subdivision (a), or (b)in the alternative, SHOW CAUSE before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California, on January 12, 2023, at 9:00 a.m., why a peremptory writ of mandate should not issue on the following grounds. First, Corporations Code section 17701.10, subdivision c)(7), precludes an operating agreement from allocating to an arbitrator the court's exclusive power to decree dissolution of a limited liability corporation in the circumstances specified in subdivision (a) of Section 17707.03, because it mandates in relevant part that "an operating agreement shall not do any of the following: & (7) Vary the power of a court to decree dissolution in the circumstances specified in subdivision (a) of Section 17707.03 & ." Second, even though Corporations Code section 17701.17, subdivision (b) permits a member of a limited liability corporation "in a written operating agreement or other writing, [to] consent & to be exclusively subject to arbitration in this state[,]" this allocation does not authorize a member to allocate to an arbitrator the court's jurisdiction to decree dissolution granted solely to the court under section 17701.10, subdivision (c)(7). Petitioner shall serve this writ upon respondent and real parties in interest. Any written return shall be served and filed on or before December 2, 2022. Petitioner may file a reply on or before December 16, 2022. In the event that respondent court complies with alternative (a) of this writ at any time prior to January 12, 2023, petitioner shall immediately so advise this court by letter and file a certified copy of the order constituting such compliance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits filed in support of Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate (1 vol; 53 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Preliminary response by Real Parties in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 3 (of 3) Pages 410?685Preliminary response by Real Parties in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 2 (of 3) Pages 161?409Preliminary response by Real Parties in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 (of 3) Pages 1?160Preliminary response by Real Parties in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Filed by Real Parties in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: * The petition for writ of mandate filed August 19, 2022, has been read and considered. Real parties in interest (RPIs) are ordered to file and serve a preliminary response on or before September 22, 2022, addressing all matters they deem material including but not limited to whether the trial court erred by compelling petitioner's fifth cause of action seeking involuntary judicial dissolution of the Beachwood Master Commercial, LLC, pursuant to Corporations Code sections 17701.10, subdivision (c)(7), and 17707.03, subdivision (a), to arbitration. Petitioner may file a reply on or before October 6, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Vol 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less