This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/13/2023 at 01:14:40 (UTC).

Cain v. The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Cain filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacot, Lance. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7743

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jacot, Lance

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gregory Dion Cain

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Joaquin County

Interested Party

The People

Not Yet Classified

Office of the District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Khuon Lay

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201-9030

Nelson C. Lu

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201-9030

Allison Lee Rosenmayer

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201-9030

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Chung Mi Choi

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Victoria Margarita Salazar

Attorney at San Joaquin District Attorney's Office

222 E Weber Avenue #202

Stockton, CA 95202

Frankie Paul Kooger

Attorney at San Joaquin District Attorney's Office

222 E. Weber Avenue #202

Stockton, CA 95202

Caitlin Mujica Casey

Attorney at San Joaquin District Attorney's Office

222 E. Weber Avenue #202

Stockton, CA 95202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Notes: The superior court having complied with this court's order of February 7, 2023, the petition for writ of mandate is dismissed as moot. ROBIE, Acting P.J., DUARTE, J., RENNER, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Order Vacating Court's Prior Order Denying Petitioner's Pretrial Penal Code 745 Motion filed in the trial court on 2/28/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Petitioner's status update of case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Palma sent. Response due:; Notes: This court is considering issuing a peremptory writ of mandate in the first instance, i.e., without first issuing an alternative writ. (Palma v. U.S. Industrial Fasteners, Inc. (1984) 36 Cal.3d 171.) Respondent court may avoid issuance of the writ by vacating its ruling and holding a hearing on petitioner's motion. Typically, an action taken pursuant to a suggestive Palma order requires respondent court first afford the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard before vacating its earlier decision. (See Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233.) However, the instant case is unusual in that it challenges inaction, and both parties agree the Penal Code section 745 motion should proceed. Accordingly, respondent court is requested to inform this court of any relevant action in the case that it takes consistent with this notice and to provide a status update on or before February 24, 2023. If respondent court chooses to act in the manner described herein, this court will dismiss the instant petition as moot. ROBIE, Acting P.J., Duarte, J., Renner., J. (See order for details.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: The People Attorney: Chung Mi Choi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: The PeopleAttorney: Chung Mi Choi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Petitioner advising the trial date of 02/17/23 was vacated and petitioner is no longer seeking a stay on this case pending the court's resolution of the petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Letter sent to real party in interest. Informal response to be served and filed by 01/30/23. Reply if any, due 10 days thereafter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate with request for stay. (Trial date: 02/17/23.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKCRFE20220008922; Trial Court Judge: Jacot, Lance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less