This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/04/2023 at 15:04:18 (UTC).

Cahill Contractors, LLC v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Cahill Contractors, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7074

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cahill Contractors, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Angela Johnson

City and County for the City of San Francisco

Bridge-Protrero Community Associates, LLC

Bridge Housing Corporation

Bridge Property Management Company

Protrero Housing Associates I, L. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Taylor Joseph Pohle

Edward Joseph Riffle

Interested Party Attorneys

Paul Anthony Matiasic

Vaheh Manoukian

Meredith Blagden Osborn

Sabrina Michelle Berdux

Dennis J. Herrera

Elisabeth Herrmann

Peter Keith Pritchard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition and/or other appropriate relief is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition and/or other appropriate relief is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to reply w/bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: w/bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel for petitioners, re: The court allowed filing of the reply without the required bookmarks. The court would like you to file the same with the required bookmarks as soon as possible.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to reply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: (no bookmarks; filed w/permission)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RPI Angela Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: email kickback for Meredith Osborn, attorney for RPI, for 2/10/23 oppo req.; corrected email address and resent this date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: oppo due March 3, 2023; reply due March 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Supplemental POS of Petition for Writ of Mandate . . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1, Pages 1 -234; Exhibits - 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition and/or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21592213; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less