This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/17/2021 at 21:17:12 (UTC).

CABRERA (MIGUEL ANGEL) ON H.C.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 CABRERA MIGUEL ANGEL ON H C was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1178

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miguel Angel Cabrera

Represa, CA 95671

Respondent

California Department of Corrections and Rehabiliation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrew J. Marx

Attorney at Law Office of Andrew J. Marx

P.O. Box 1225

Mount Shasta, CA 96067

Respondent Attorney

Eric L. Christoffersen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; issues limited; Notes: The petition for review is granted. The issue to be briefed and argued is limited to the following: Did the sentencing court err by finding petitioner's conviction for battery with serious bodily injury (Pen. Code, 243, subd. (d)) was a serious felony (id., 667, subd. (a)(1), 1192.7, subd. (c)(8)), despite the jury's failure to reach a verdict on the attached allegation that petitioner personally inflicted great bodily injury (id., 12022.7, subd. (a))? (See Apprendi v. New Jersey (2000) 530 U.S. 466; Blakely v. Washington (2004) 542 U.S. 296; Cunningham v. California (2007) 549 U.S. 270.) Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger and Groban, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 30, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: C058828 - People v. Cabrera Miscellaneous documents, briefs and reporter's transcript (5).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Additional record requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Miguel Angel Cabrera Attorney: Andrew J. Marx

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C091962; Disposition: Petition denied on merits by opinion; Trial Court: Siskiyou County Superior Court - Main (Yreka); Trial Court Case Number: MCYKCRBF20076242; Trial Court: Siskiyou County Superior Court - Main (Yreka); Trial Court Case Number: SCCRHCCR20189121

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric L. Christoffersen