This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/08/2022 at 22:03:23 (UTC).

B.W. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 B W filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5851

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

B. W.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

C. A.

E. A.

Not Yet Classified

Cherokee Nation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Whitney M. Kulp

Tracy Marie De Soto

Interested Party Attorneys

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Christina Z. Beede

Ashley M. Mooney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/17/2022

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for extraordinary writ relief with request for stay is denied on the merits. (See Joyce G. v. Superior Court (1995) 38 Cal.App.4th 1501, 1513-1514.) ROBIE, Acting P.J.; DUARTE, J.; RENNER, J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: By RPI Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency. Supplemental.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: RAYE, P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022

DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: by RPI Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency to juvenile writ petition.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ petition filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: By petitioner with material attached.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Petitioner B.W. associating attorney Tracy De Soto.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The parties re: Service on Cherokee Nation Indian tribe.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due 4/14/22. Preliminary response due 10 Days (PS), or 15 Days (MS/ES) thereafter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 2 Vols. CT (401 pp.); 1 Vol. RT (265 pp.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended notice of filing of notice of intent to file writ petition.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court 03/09/22. Record due 03/29/22.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020185; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less