This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2022 at 02:19:35 (UTC).

Burunsuzyan v. Roger

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Burunsuzyan filed an Other lawsuit against Roger. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sotelo, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3917

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sotelo, David

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Maro Burunsuzyan

Defendant and Appellant

Dimitri Roger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Perry

Attorney at Law Offices Of Robert E. Weiss Incorporated

920 S. Village Oaks Drive

Covina, CA 91724

Cris A. Klingerman

Attorney at Law Offices Of Robert E. Weiss, Inc.

920 Village Oaks Drive

Covina, CA 91724

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Kimberly Anne Wright

2601 Main St. Ste 1200

Irvine, CA 92614

Kimberly A. Wright

Attorney at Revolve Law Group LLP,

2601 Main St. Ste 1200

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

B313917

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The order denying Roger's motion to set aside the default judgment is affirmed. Burunsuzyan is to recover her costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Feuer, Gail Ruderman; Participants: Segal, John (Concur) Perluss, Dennis M. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The order denying Roger's motion to set aside the default judgment is affirmed. Burunsuzyan is to recover her costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Kimberly Wright for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: April 7, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Dimitri Roger Attorney: Kimberly A. Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 1 (of 3) Pages 1-79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 7, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Dimitri Roger Attorney: Kimberly A. Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Steven Lavallee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Dimitri RogerAttorney: Kimberly A. Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: no fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on June 21, 2021 by Dimitri Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV08621; Trial Court Judge: Sotelo, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Anne Wright