This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/26/2022 at 01:05:16 (UTC).

Build America, LLC v. Ganezer

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Build America, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Ganezer. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0443

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Build America, LLC

Appellate Divison

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Defendant and Appellant

David Ganezer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Jerome Revitz

Attorney at Raiskin & Revitz

1875 Century Park East, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Hon. Chester Horn

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Patti Jo McKay

Attorney at Appellate Division Los Angeles Superior Court

111 N. Hill Street, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Scott Everett Schutzman

Attorney at Law Offices of Scott E. Schutzman

2124 Main St, Ste 130

Huntington Beach, CA 92648-6443

John William Sullivan

Attorney at Attorney at Law

17532 Miranda Street

Encino, CA 91316

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: One Box (03R00219, BV033522) Box Contents: Three volumes & one volume of BS175851 containing order refiling matter under case number BV033522.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition summarily denied by order.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for transfer filed on May 19, 2022. Petitioner does not show that transfer is necessary to secure uniformity of decision or to settle an important question of law. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1006(c)(3).) Accordingly, the petition is denied. STRATTON, P. J. GRIMES, J. HARUTUNIAN, J.* __________ *Judge of the San Diego County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition Of Respondent, Build America, LLC, To Petition To Transfer An Appellate Division Case To the Court Of Appeal (CRC 8.1006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: One Box (03R00219, BV033522) Box Contents: Three volumes & one volume of BS175851 containing order refiling Petition under case number BV033522.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellant David Ganezer's Notice of Related Proceeding Before Court of Appeal Attorneys for Appellant David Ganezer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition to transfer from appellate division filed.; Notes: Transfer.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Build America Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN JOHN WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHUTZMAN, SCOTT E.