This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/26/2021 at 10:20:59 (UTC).

Bryant v. County of Santa Clara

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Bryant filed an Other lawsuit against County of Santa Clara. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8563

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hayashi, Roberta

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Sandra Bryant

San Jose, CA 95119

Respondent and Defendant

County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Lisa E. Aguiar

Attorney at Michael Sullivan & Associates, LLP

30699 Russell Ranch Rd. Suite 200

Westlake Village, CA 91362-7317

Eric Henri DeWames

Attorney at Michael Sullivan & Associates, LLP

30699 Russell Ranch Rd Ste 200

Westlake Village, CA 91362-7317

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant Sandra Bryant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sandra Bryant, Filed 10/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa E. Aguiar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEWAMES ERIC HENRI