This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/24/2022 at 17:53:03 (UTC).

BRUNI v. EDWARD THOMAS HOSPITALITY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 BRUNI filed an Other lawsuit against EDWARD THOMAS HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9117

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Theodore Bruni

Defendants and Respondents

The Edward Thomas Hospitality Corporation

Neptune's Walk, LLC d/b/a Casa Del Mar Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Helen Mei You

Attorney at Hennig Ruiz & Singh PC

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1908

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Sereena J Singh

Attorney at Hennig Ruiz & Singh, p.c.

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1908

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Rob A. Hennig

Attorney at Hennig Ruiz P.C.

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1908

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Samuel Marion Brown

Attorney at Hennig Ruiz & Singh

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1908

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2623

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

David Jonathan Fishman

Attorney at Ballard, Rosenberg, Golper & Savitt, LLP

15760 Ventura Blvd Fl 18

Encino, CA 91436-3029

Janet Sylvia Soultanian

Attorney at Ballard Rosenberg Golper & Savitt, LLP

15760 Ventura Blvd Fl 18

Encino, CA 91436-3029

John J. Manier

Attorney at Ballard Rosenberg Golper & Savitt, LLP

15760 Ventura Blvd. 18Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal is denied. The court declines to review this matter on its own motion. The matter is now final.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including September 13, 2021. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- The Edward Thomas Hospitality Corporation, Defendant and Respondent John J. Manier, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Neptune's Walk, LLC d/b/a Casa Del Mar Hotel, Defendant and Respondent John J. Manier, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Theodore Bruni Attorney: Helen Mei You

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Premature request for depublication. From Helen M. You, for Theodore Bruni, appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305689; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV35693

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEPTUNE'S WALK LLC DBA CASA DEL MAR HOTEL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN DAVID JONATHAN