This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/11/2022 at 20:02:01 (UTC).

Brown v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Brown filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ryan, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3213

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ryan, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eric Brown

Calipatria, CA 92233

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. William Ryan

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on September 16, 2022. We have also reviewed our files in case numbers (1) B243489 (petitioner's appeal from the conviction for which he is currently incarcerated), and (2) B301640, B306258, B307727, B310578, B317288, B319468 and B321291(prior writ proceedings arising out of the same conviction). Petitioner asks this court to direct the trial court (specifically, Judge William Ryan) to rule on a petition for a writ of habeas corpus which petitioner mailed to the trial court in January of this year. However, as stated in our July 28, 2022 order denying the petition in case number B321291, Judge Craig Mitchell issued a minute order on July 11, 2022, advising that the court was not in possession of the petition and asking petitioner to mail the court a copy of the petition. Nothing in the current petition suggests that petitioner has mailed a copy of the petition to the trial court. There is no basis for this court to direct the trial court to rule on a petition which is not in the trial court's possession. In addition, this court will not direct that the petition - once it is received - be decided by a particular judicial officer. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Criminal Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant