This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/18/2021 at 15:40:37 (UTC).

BROWN v. CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 BROWN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5510

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Mark A. Brown

Defendants and Respondents

California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Employment Development Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Gary S. Garfinkle

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Dane Christian Barca

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including February 10, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Mark A. Brown Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service reflecting San Francisco Superior Court. California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board, Defendant and Respondent Dane Christian Barca, State Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board Attorney: Dane Christian Barca Defendant and Respondent: Employment Development Department Attorney: Dane Christian Barca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Mark A. Brown Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: A155388; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CPF12512499

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dane Christian Barca