This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/29/2021 at 16:39:01 (UTC).

BRODKIN v. ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 BRODKIN filed an Other lawsuit against ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0080

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Francine Brodkin

St. Joseph Hospital of Orange

St. Joseph Health System

Defendants and Appellants

St. Joseph Hospital of Orange

St. Joseph Health System

Not Yet Classified

Hodes Milman Ikuta

Gharibian Law

California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform

Berman & Riedel, LLP

Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP

Peter George Lomhoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa T. Flint

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Martin N. Buchanan

Attorney at Attorney at Law

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

David P. Pruett

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter & Franzen

111 West Ocean Boulevard, 14Th Floor P.O. Box 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Margaret M. Holm

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

17901 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

David P. Pruett

Attorney at Carroll Kelly Trotter & Franzen

111 West Ocean Boulevard, 14Th Floor P.O. Box 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801-5636

Margaret M. Holm

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

17901 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Benjamin T. Ikuta

Attorney at Hodes Milman Ikuta

9210 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Art Gharibian

Attorney at Gharibian Law, APC

101 North Brand Boulevard, Suite 1970

Glendale, CA 91203

Peter George Lomhoff

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1300 Clay Street, #820

Oakland, CA 94612

Harlan Joseph Zaback

Attorney at Berman & Riedel, LLP

12264 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-3062

Brian Scott Van Allen

Attorney at Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP

1905 East Route 66, Suite 102

Glendora, CA 91740-4679

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP Attorney: Brian Scott Van Allen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Berman & Riedel, LLP Attorney: Harlan Joseph Zaback

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform Attorney: Peter George Lomhoff Pub/Depublication Requestor: Peter George Lomhoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Gharibian Law Attorney: Art Gharibian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Hodes Milman Ikuta Attorney: Benjamin T. Ikuta Per CA order dated 7/22/2021, their Opinion does not meet the standards set forth in CRC, rule 8.1105(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G058192; Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00908376

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOMHOFF, PETER G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN ALLEN BRIAN SCOTT