This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/17/2023 at 21:01:05 (UTC).

BRILEY v. CITY OF WEST COVINA

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 BRILEY filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0321

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Jason Briley

Appellant and Defendant

City of West Covina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Oshea Orchid

Gregory W. Smith

Douglas G. Benedon

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Krista MacNevin Jee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing partial depublication of the opinion is denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City of West Covina Attorney: Krista MacNevin Jee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City of West Covina Attorney: Krista MacNevin Jee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B295666; Disposition: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC630552

[+] Read More [-] Read Less