This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/07/2023 at 05:05:01 (UTC).

Briggs v. Airbnb, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Briggs filed an Other lawsuit against Airbnb, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6633

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Barbara Briggs

Dennis Briggs

Defendant and Appellant

Airbnb, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Jamie G. Goldstein

Elise R. Sanguinetti

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Jon Stuart Dean

Paul W. Hughes

Connor J. Suozzo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Appellant Airbnb, Inc. having filed a Request for Dismissal on September 7, 2023, this appeal is hereby dismissed. As stated in the request, the parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. The clerk of this court is directed to concurrently file this order and issue the remittitur.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Notes: Appellant Airbnb, Inc. having filed a Request for Dismissal on September 7, 2023, this appeal is hereby dismissed. As stated in the request, the parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. The clerk of this court is directed to concurrently file this order and issue the remittitur.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: From McDermott Will & Emery, attorneys for appellant Airbnb

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: request for oral argument from respondent; Respondents did not file a brief; therefore, cannot request oral argument. (CRC 8.220(a)(2).)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: appellant's counsel, respondent's counsel cc'd; Counsel, Respondent's counsel inquired about their notice of settlement they attempted to submit on July 24, 2023. It was rejected because it did not comply with the e-formatting rules; however, it also was not compliant with CRC 8.244(a)(1). As appellant's counsel, it is your responsibility to notify the court that a settlement has taken place. Please submit a notice of settlement with a declaration under penalty of perjury and a statement regarding costs on appeal by Friday, August 18 at 8:00 a.m. Pacific Time. This notice can include a request for dismissal. Otherwise, the court will dismiss the appeal within 45 days from the filing of the notice per the rules of court. The notice and request for dismissal can be filed jointly. The court will move forward with this appeal if it does not receive a compliant notice of settlement by the stated time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
11/30/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Airbnb, Inc. Attorney: David Theodore Hayek

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: civil case information statement; missing copy of judgment/order being appealed (see NOTE TO APPELLANT on pg. 1, CRC 8.100(g))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Airbnb, Inc.Attorney: David Theodore Hayek

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check 62281 from Specialized Legal Services o/b/o Gordon Rees, attorneys for appellant AirBnb

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/18/2022. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/18/2022 by Counsel for Defendant Airbnb, Inc. appealing order from 05/23/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21592261; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less