This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/24/2023 at 02:22:52 (UTC).

Brenkle et al. v. The Superior Court of Contra Costa County

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 Brenkle filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas, Danielle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6155

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Douglas, Danielle

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Thomas R. Brenkle

Natalie A. Brenkle

Respondent

The Superior Court of Contra Costa County

Interested Parties

Frank J. McGuire

Bethanie A. McGuire

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Richard D. Wheeler

Attorney at McNamara, Ney et al.

3480 Buskirk Avenue Suite 250

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Robert A. Olson

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3697

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Joseph Anthony Motta

Attorney at Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law

196 Boulevard Way, Ste 20

Walnut Creek, CA 94595-1167

Interested Party Attorney

David W. Anderson

Attorney at Law Offices of David W. Anderson

3100 Oak Road, Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: "REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI, REVIEW, PROHIBITION, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. HACKETT"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Frank J. McGuire Attorney: David W. Anderson OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI, REVIEW, PROHIBITION, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Frank J. McGuireAttorney: David W. Anderson; Notes: OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI, REVIEW, PROHIBITION, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: Real party in interest may serve and file an informal opposition to the above-captioned petition on or before January 9, 2023. Any reply shall be filed on or before January 18, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Status update on petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Status update on petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The request for stay is denied without prejudice to renewal based on updated developments, if appropriate. Petitioners shall also inform this Court in writing of any developments in the trial court that may affect the pendency of the matter before this Court. (fuj,pet,rod)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Petitioners Thomas R. Brenkle and Natalie A. Brenkle move this Court to take judicial notice of the February 11, 2022 grant deed for Assessor's Parcel No. 354-310-021-2, commonly known as 400 Cummings Skyway, Martinez, California, etc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Vol. 1 of 1, Pages 1 - 464 of 464

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Certiorari, Review, Prohibition, or Other Appropriate Relief Temporary Stay Requested Contempt Sentencing Pending (10/5/22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1501952; Trial Court Judge: Douglas, Danielle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Contra Costa County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON, DAVID W