This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 07:32:22 (UTC).

BRE ICONIC LQR OWNER v. S.C. (JANE DOE)

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 BRE ICONIC LQR OWNER filed an Other lawsuit against C JANE DOE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9594

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC

Waldorf=Astoria Management, LLC

Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Scott Loeding

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming, LLP

801 S. Grand Avenue, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4613

James Olney Eiler

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming, LLP

801 S. Grand Avenue, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Interested Party Attorneys

Sophia M. Achermann

Attorney at Fiore Achermann

340 Pine Street, Suite 503

San Francisco, CA 94104

Robert William Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Law Offices, P.C.

700 Airport Boulevard, Suite 160

Burlingame, CA 94010

Jennifer L Fiore

Attorney at Fiore Achermann

340 Pine Street, Suite 503

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Waldorf=Astoria Management, LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Scott Loeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Jane Doe Attorney: Robert William Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Petitioner: Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Waldorf=Astoria Management, LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Scott Loeding $710 paid via check #031117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Waldorf=Astoria Management, LLC Attorney: Scott Loeding Petitioner: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Scott Loeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely petition for review. Not in compliance with rules. Counsel to re-submit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E077035; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1903212

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRE ICONIC LQR OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALDORF ASTORIA MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant