This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/19/2021 at 13:14:11 (UTC).

Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC et al. v. The Superior Court; Jane Doe

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Jane Doe. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klatchko, Kira. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7035

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Klatchko, Kira

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Waldorf=Astoria Management, LLC

Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.

Bre Iconic LQR Owner LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Scott Loeding

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming, LLP

801 S. Grand Avenue, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

James Olney Eiler

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming, LLP

801 S. Grand Avenue, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer L Fiore

Attorney at FIORE ACHERMANN

340 Pine Street, Suite 503

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sophia M. Achermann

Attorney at FIORE ACHERMANN

340 Pine Street, Suite 503

San Francisco, CA 94104

Robert William Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Law Offices, P.C.

700 Airport Boulevard., Suite 160

Burlingame, CA 94010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Application for stay denied dtd Jul 28, 2021; S269594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Reply in support of petition for review; S269594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: (S269594)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for stay is lifted. (Miller Menetrez McKinster)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: In support of petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Proceedings are stayed pending determination of petition on its merits or further order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: preliminary, by RPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by RPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: preliminary opposition - missing bookmarks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 2 volumes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioners re: petn is missing bookmarks and CIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Petitioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: EXL 2 vol; bkmarks lack exhibit description

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate w/request for stay

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRE ICONIC LQR OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALDORF ASTORIA MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant