This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2023 at 00:54:43 (UTC).

Boyd v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Boyd filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6405

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Robert Boyd

Appellant and Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John P. McDonnell

Attorney at Law Offices of John P. McDonnell

295 89Th Street Suite 200

Daly City, CA 94015

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jane M. Chung

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd. Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Michael Patrick Sweeney

Attorney at SWEENEY APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503-6534

Michael Caling Yu

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503-6534

Catherine K. Fong

Attorney at SWEENEY APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503-6534

Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd. Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via credit card by Sweeney APC, attorneys for appellant Nissan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: mike@sweeneyapc.com; myu@sweeneyapc.com; cfong@sweeneyapc.com; nmaugeri@sweeneyapc.com; jchung@sweeneyapc.com Re: bounced check in A166405, Div. 2, Boyd [respondent] v. Nissan North America, Inc. [appellant] TO ALL COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT: This is Channing of Division 4. Please be advised that the $775.00 check submitted to the Court of Appeal for the filing fee is defective as it has "bounced" due to a "Frozen/Blocked Account." Please promptly cure this defect. Step 1 is relying to this email with information on how your office will address this matter. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc. Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Michael P. Sweeney, attorney for appellant, with copy of Order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 02/21/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc.Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane M. Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc.Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney; Notes: Michael P. Sweeney, attorney for appellant, with copy of Order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/24/22, designating CT w/o RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1773, Sweeney APC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 10/14/2022 by Counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. appealing order from 10/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 21CIV01156

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUNG JANE MINKYUNG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU MICHAEL CALING

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAUGERI NICHOLAS II