This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/19/2023 at 03:25:50 (UTC).

Bowen v. Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Bowen filed an Other lawsuit against Burns McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karnow, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6793

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karnow, Curtis

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Eugene Bowen

Respondents and Defendants

Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.

HMT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

David Zarmi

8950 W Olympic Blvd., #533

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer K. Stinnett

Attorney at Christensen Hsu Sipes LLP

2485 Natomas Park Drive, Suite 315

Sacramento, CA 95833

Jaclyn Carney

Attorney at Christensen Hsu Sipes LLP

2485 Natomas Park Drive Suite 315

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/05/2023 By 60 Day(s) AOB to 05/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 01/17/2023. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 1/13/23; 15 days to cure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene Bowen Attorney: David Zarmi David Zarmi, attorney for appellant, w/copy of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 05/05/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene BowenAttorney: David Zarmi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene BowenAttorney: David Zarmi; Notes: David Zarmi, attorney for appellant, w/copy of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant substitute David Zarmi as counsel of record in place of Andrew Wolff and Tony Ruch.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rejected Substitution of Attorney for appellant submitted on 12/27/2022, for the following reason: The document only contains the signature of new counsel David Zarmi. Neither appellant nor prior counsel have signed the substitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Law Offices of Andrew Wolff, check No. 12815

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/19/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Eugene Bowen appealing judgment from 11/03/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC17561849; Trial Court Judge: Karnow, Curtis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less