This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/26/2021 at 14:48:47 (UTC).

Bowen et al. v. City of Chico et al.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Bowen filed an Other lawsuit against City of Chico. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3955

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Aaron Bowen et al.

Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association, Inc

Jack Danielson et al.

Defendants and Appellants

City of Chico et al.

City of Chico

Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association, Inc

Jack Danielson et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Diane G. Kindermann

Attorney at Abbott and Kindermann, Inc.

2100 21St Strreet

Sacramento, CA 95818

Glen C. Hansen

Attorney at Abbott & Kindermann, Inc.

2100 21St Street

Sacramento, CA 95818

Julia Vohl Islas

Attorney at Stratman, Stratman & Williams-Abrego

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

Sarah Kathryn Glatt

Attorney at Diepenbrock & Cotter LLP

1435 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

John P. Cotter

Attorney at Diepenbrock & Cotter LLP

1435 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Vincent Carlton Ewing

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 400, West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Eric Golas Salbert

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 400, West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Julia Vohl Islas

Attorney at Stratman, Stratman & Williams-Abrego

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

Sarah Kathryn Glatt

Attorney at Diepenbrock & Cotter LLP

1435 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

John P. Cotter

Attorney at Diepenbrock & Cotter LLP

1435 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Vincent Carlton Ewing

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 400, West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Eric Golas Salbert

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 400, West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed by motion; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion granted appeal dismissed.; Notes: BLEASE, Acting P.J., ROBIE, J., MURRAY, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant's to respondents' motion to dismiss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: by respondents Bowen et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondents Bowen et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondents' due 05/24/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant's filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Mediation Statement due: 5/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 4/20/2021. Denial of Writ of Mandamus.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Butte County Superior Court - Main; County: Butte; Trial Court Case Number: 19CV01362; Trial Court Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Chico is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EWING VINCENT CARLTON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALBERT ERIC GOLAS