This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/06/2023 at 00:10:31 (UTC).

Botai et al. v. American Honda Motor Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Botai filed an Other lawsuit against American Honda Motor Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7106

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Sharon Botai

Sam Neang

Defendant and Respondent

American Honda Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph V. Bui

Cynthia Elaine Tobisman

Radomir R. Kirnos

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Justin Hays Sanders

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 10/06/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 10/06/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal sheet from Sonoma Superior Court. 8.124 designation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-2(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Jennifer Roux; dated 5.18.23;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Designation of record attached (filed 2/7/2023 in superior court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sharon Botai Attorney: Radomir R. Kirnos Plaintiff and Appellant: Sam Neang (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Radomir Kirnos, Cynthia Tobisman, and Joseph Bui associated as co-counsel for appellants Botai and Neang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 10/06/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sharon BotaiAttorney: Cynthia Elaine Tobisman Attorney: Joseph V. Bui Attorney: Radomir R. Kirnos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sharon BotaiAttorney: Radomir R. Kirnos Plaintiff and Appellant: Sam Neang; Notes: (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/27/2023 by Counsel for Plaintiff Sharona Botai and Sam Neang appealing judgment from 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sonoma County Superior Court - Main; County: Sonoma; Trial Court Case Number: SCV267008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less