This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/04/2023 at 10:02:35 (UTC).

Borja et al. v. Victor Bringas Construction

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Borja filed an Other lawsuit against Victor Bringas Construction. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manoukian, Socrates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9278

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Manoukian, Socrates

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Alex Borja

Eugenia Serrano Borja

Respondent and Defendant

Victor Bringas Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

John Phillip Boggs

Hugh Robert Burns

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

John Anthony Burke

Carol Lee Healey

Paul Christian Scheley

 

Court Documents

H049278

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final We affirm the judgment. VBC is awarded its costs on appeal; CEW, AMD, CCL; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Wilson II, Charles E.; Participants: Lie, Cynthia C. (Concur) Danner, Allison M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) We affirm the judgment. VBC is awarded its costs on appeal; CEW, AMD, CCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: Atty Hugh Burns

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Oral argument in the above-entitled cause will be heard on Tuesday, August 9, 2022, at 9:30 a.m., by remote video appearance through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Carol Healey for respondent (15 minutes).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Hugh Burns for appellants (15 minutes).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: May 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: -Fees for preparation of clerk's transcript not timely deposited 8.122(c)(3). ($1985) Filed 09/20/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice of estimated costs Filed 09/09/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed. ($80 + $50 admin fee) Filed 09/08/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's notice of compliance Filed 09/08/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2). Notice designating reporter's transcript or notice of intent to proceed without reporter's transcript not timely filed. Notice designating record for clerk's transcript not timely filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Borja et al., Filed 7/12/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 17CV318915; Trial Court Judge: Manoukian, Socrates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less