This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/19/2023 at 17:00:25 (UTC).

Borja et al. v. City of San Jose

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Borja filed an Other lawsuit against City of San Jose. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manoukian, Socrates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8996

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Manoukian, Socrates

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Eugenia Serrano Borja

Alex Borja

Defendant and Respondent

City of San Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

John Phillip Boggs

Hugh Robert Burns

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Margo Laskowska

J. Richard Doyle

Kendra Elizabeth McGee-Davies

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2022

DispositionDescription: Case transferred out of district; Disposition Type: Final The following matters listed in Attachment 1 of this order, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District, are transferred to the Second Appellate District: H048996 Borja et al. v. City of San Jose H048356 Leigh v. Stephens Institute, Inc H047725 Ankola v. Ankola H048868 Ankola v. Ankola H048991 Ankola v. Ankola H049582 SASCO v. CSI Electrical Contractors, Inc. et al. H048116 Maria Elena's Restaurant, Inc. v. Boyes et al. H047533 Seto et al. v. Kwan et al. H048815 Jain v. Jain H049282 PF1, Inc. v. Suba et al. H049086 Javanmard (Asgari) v. Asgari H049618 Koenig v. Koenig et al. H048736 Mueller v. Buzorius H049525 Critchfield Mechanical Inc. v. Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America H049675 Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America v. Critchfield Mechanical Inc. H048733 King v. McMichael et al. H047150 Sholtis v. Sholtis H049367 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Japantown Development, L.P. et al. H047608 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Miraido Corporation et al. H047427 The People v. The North River Ins. Co. et al. H049454 Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Parmerlee et al. H048732 Wang v. Byun et al. H049034 Wang v. Byun et al. H049065 Wang v. Byun et al. H048823 Li v. Chen H048802 Hudson v. Hudson et al. H049384 Flickinger v. Finwall H049435 Doe v. John F. Kennedy University et al. H047788 Carrillo v. County of Santa Clara H049661 Kirby v. Rushmyfile, Inc. H048405 Barbaccia et al. v. GBR Magic Sands MHP, LLC H048021 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H048084 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H049062 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049160 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049368 AquaLegacy Development, LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H048978 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. AquaLegacy Development LLC H048729 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College et al. H048838 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College H048061 The People v. Hernandez

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case.; Notes: The following matters listed in Attachment 1 of this order, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District, are transferred to the Second Appellate District: H048996 Borja et al. v. City of San Jose H048356 Leigh v. Stephens Institute, Inc H047725 Ankola v. Ankola H048868 Ankola v. Ankola H048991 Ankola v. Ankola H049582 SASCO v. CSI Electrical Contractors, Inc. et al. H048116 Maria Elena's Restaurant, Inc. v. Boyes et al. H047533 Seto et al. v. Kwan et al. H048815 Jain v. Jain H049282 PF1, Inc. v. Suba et al. H049086 Javanmard (Asgari) v. Asgari H049618 Koenig v. Koenig et al. H048736 Mueller v. Buzorius H049525 Critchfield Mechanical Inc. v. Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America H049675 Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America v. Critchfield Mechanical Inc. H048733 King v. McMichael et al. H047150 Sholtis v. Sholtis H049367 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Japantown Development, L.P. et al. H047608 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Miraido Corporation et al. H047427 The People v. The North River Ins. Co. et al. H049454 Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Parmerlee et al. H048732 Wang v. Byun et al. H049034 Wang v. Byun et al. H049065 Wang v. Byun et al. H048823 Li v. Chen H048802 Hudson v. Hudson et al. H049384 Flickinger v. Finwall H049435 Doe v. John F. Kennedy University et al. H047788 Carrillo v. County of Santa Clara H049661 Kirby v. Rushmyfile, Inc. H048405 Barbaccia et al. v. GBR Magic Sands MHP, LLC H048021 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H048084 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H049062 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049160 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049368 AquaLegacy Development, LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H048978 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. AquaLegacy Development LLC H048729 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College et al. H048838 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College H048061 The People v. Hernandez

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Navarrete, Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 10.1000(a)(1)(C) and at the direction of the Administrative Presiding Justices of the Second and Sixth Appellate Districts, I am requesting the transfer of the following matters to the Second Appellate District. H048996 Borja et al. v. City of San Jose H048356 Leigh v. Stephens Institute, Inc H047725 Ankola v. Ankola H048868 Ankola v. Ankola H048991 Ankola v. Ankola H049582 SASCO v. CSI Electrical Contractors, Inc. et al. H048116 Maria Elena's Restaurant, Inc. v. Boyes et al. H047533 Seto et al. v. Kwan et al. H048815 Jain v. Jain H049282 PF1, Inc. v. Suba et al. H049086 Javanmard (Asgari) v. Asgari H049618 Koenig v. Koenig et al. H048736 Mueller v. Buzorius H049525 Critchfield Mechanical Inc. v. Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America H049675 Travelers' Property Casualty Company of America v. Critchfield Mechanical Inc. H048733 King v. McMichael et al. H047150 Sholtis v. Sholtis H049367 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Japantown Development, L.P. et al. H047608 San Jose Nihonmachi, LLC v. Miraido Corporation et al. H047427 The People v. The North River Ins. Co. et al. H049454 Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Parmerlee et al. H048732 Wang v. Byun et al. H049034 Wang v. Byun et al. H049065 Wang v. Byun et al. H048823 Li v. Chen H048802 Hudson v. Hudson et al. H049384 Flickinger v. Finwall H049435 Doe v. John F. Kennedy University et al. H047788 Carrillo v. County of Santa Clara H049661 Kirby v. Rushmyfile, Inc. H048405 Barbaccia et al. v. GBR Magic Sands MHP, LLC H048021 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H048084 Borjon Auto Center City, Inc. v. Sentry Select Insurance Company H049062 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049160 AquaLegacy Development LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H049368 AquaLegacy Development, LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC et al. H048978 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. AquaLegacy Development LLC H048729 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College et al. H048838 Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College H048061 The People v. Hernandez The transfer of these matters is necessary to equalize the workload between districts and to ensure their timely resolution.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alex Borja Attorney: John Phillip Boggs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alex BorjaAttorney: John Phillip Boggs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Ruling on respondent's request for judicial notice is deferred for consideration with the merits of the appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Resp request for jud. notice and declaration. Respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
06/14/2021

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance The Appellant was notified of a failure to comply on June 10, 2021 and has now cured the default. Record preparation will now proceed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance The Appellant was notified of a failure to comply on June 3, 2021 and has now cured the default. Record preparation will now proceed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Appellant's Default Notice Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed. (Appellant already paid $80 for RT deposit but still owes $50 admin fee)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Notice of Deposit Court Fees for the Reporter's Transcript and Designation of Reporter's Transcript

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's Default Notice Appellant Alex Borja et al, you are hereby notified as follows: Deposit or fee waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Contact information updated Margo Laskowska.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2021

DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Borja et al., filed 4/5/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less