Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/06/2021 at 08:53:39 (UTC).

BOOKER v. IMERYS TALC AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 BOOKER filed an Other lawsuit against IMERYS TALC AMERICA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6562

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Mary Grace Gavino

Kaylie Klitzing

Cheryl Booker

Sienna Gavino

Denise Rodriguez

Julie Mae Porter

Defendants and Appellants

BASF Catalysts LLC

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Cyprus Amax Minerals Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Joseph Donald Satterley

Attorney at Kazan McClain Satterley Lyons Greenwood & Oberman

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Denyse F. Clancy

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607-3858

Ted W. Pelletier

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood, PLC

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Michael T. Stewart

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Samuel David Jubelirer

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1 Market Plaza, 24Th Floor Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Bradford J De Jardin

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jennifer J Lee

Attorney at Dentons USA LLP

One Market Plaza Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jules Solomon Zeman

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Frederic William Norris

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 S Figueroa St Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5709

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Cheryl Booker Attorney: Denyse F. Clancy *Per the Court of Appeal this opinion does not meet the requirements for publication*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: A153835; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG15796166

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BASF CATALYSTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denyse F. Clancy