This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/24/2022 at 11:15:31 (UTC).

Bolden et al. v. Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Bolden filed an Other lawsuit against Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duffy-Lewis, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5389

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Daphne Bolden

Michell Shenkin

Appellant and Defendant

Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Taylor M. Prainito

Attorney at Southern California Labor Law Group, PC

1875 Century Park E, Ste 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2506

Stephen James Kepler

28241 Crown Valley Pkwy, Ste F

Laguna Niguel, CA 92677-4442

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Monica Martelli Quinn

Attorney at Littler Mendelson LLP,

633 W. 5Th St. Fl 63

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicole Vongchanglor

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

633 W. Fifth Street 63Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 27, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Nicole Vongchanglor dated 11/2/2021 re CIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. Attorney: Monica Martelli Quinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC.Attorney: Monica Martelli Quinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Per Ingrid Shin of appellant's counsel's office, Civil Case Information Statement submitted on October 18, 2021 is rejected due to it's missing information. Appellant will submit another civil case information statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Sept. 17, 2021: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Co. of Los Angeles, LLC. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on October 14, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 1054071 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 17, 2021: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Co. of Los Angeles, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV41182; Trial Court Judge: Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VONGCHANGLOR NICOLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINN MONICA M. ESQ.