This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/21/2023 at 14:07:36 (UTC).

Bohanan v. MV Transportation Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Bohanan filed an Other lawsuit against MV Transportation Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1293

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Janelle Nicole Bohanan

Respondent and Defendant

MV Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Kiley Lynn Grombacher

Attorney at Braley Grombacher, LLP

31365 Oak Crest Drive, Ste 130

Westlake Village, CA 91361-3089

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Vanessa Kathryn Herzog

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

10960 Wilshire Boulevard, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Nicholas McGuigan Gedo

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman, LLP

10960 Wilshire Blvd. 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed May 9, 2022, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (May 9, 2022 by Janelle Nicole Bohanan. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed May 9, 2022 by Janelle Nicole Bohanan. [Judgment of dismissal attached.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV09281

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas M. Gedo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG VANESSA K.