This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/10/2021 at 23:37:56 (UTC).

Boer & Sons Inc. v. Gomes

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Boer Sons Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Gomes. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandhu, Sonny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3110

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sandhu, Sonny

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff

Boer & Sons Inc.

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant

Robert W. Gomes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jakrun S. Sodhi

Attorney at Sodhi Law Group

1301 K Street, Suite F

Modesto, CA 95354

Elizabeth Dunn Rhodes

Attorney at Clapp Moroney Vucinich et al

5860 Owens Drive, Ste. 410

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant Attorney

Kathleen P. Clack, Esq.

6061 N. Fresno Street, #101

Fresno, CA 93710

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: On 9/23/21; for discrepancies on designation; amended designation due within 15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Letter from superior court dated 9/23/21 re: Notice of Default dated 9/16/21 was cured on 9/20/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 9/20/21; for CTX & RTX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 9/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the Court has determined that the entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, are reinstated as of the date of this letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Rhodes obo Respondent Boer & Sons, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rejected Respondent's Mediation Questionnaire for failure to attach a copy of the verdict, order, or judgment appealed from.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Clack obo Applts Gomes et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statements (2) submitted by Atty Clack through TrueFiling; neither one has the judgment/order being appealed from attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Atty Clack obo Applts Gomes et al. (Due: 8/11/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Clack obo Applts Gomes et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 by Atty Clack obo Applt Gomes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Atty Clack obo Applts Gomes et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Clack obo Applts Gomes et al. appeal from 6/17/21 Order granting in part and denying in part the Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Stanislaus County Superior Court - Main; County: Stanislaus; Trial Court Case Number: 2019054; Trial Court Judge: Sandhu, Sonny

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLACK, KATHLEEN P