This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/23/2023 at 11:00:16 (UTC).

Blvd 6200 Owner North, LLC v. Barry's Bootcamp, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Blvd 6200 Owner North, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Barry's Bootcamp, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beaudet, Teresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3184

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beaudet, Teresa

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Blvd 6200 Owner North, LLC

Appellant and Defendant

Barry's Bootcamp, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Abtin Shakouri

Attorney at Goodkin Law Group, APC

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 675

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1513

Daniel Louis Goodkin

Attorney at Goodkin Law Group, APC

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 675

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Murad Salim

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher Dale Beatty

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Barry's Bootcamp, LLC Attorney: Murad Salim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Barry's Bootcamp, LLCAttorney: Murad Salim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (August 15, 2022 by Barry's Bootcamp, LLC. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #401877 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on August 15, 2022 by Barry's Bootcamp, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCV03102; Trial Court Judge: Beaudet, Teresa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less